# Use formal written methods, including long multiplication, to solve a range of problems

## Switch to our new maths teaching resources

Slide decks, worksheets, quizzes and lesson planning guidance designed for your classroom.

Play new resources video

## Lesson details

### Key learning points

1. In this lesson, we will use our written multiplication skills to solve problems.

### Licence

This content is made available by Oak National Academy Limited and its partners and licensed under Oak’s terms & conditions (Collection 1), except where otherwise stated.

## Video

Share with pupils

## Worksheet

Share with pupils

## Starter quiz

Share with pupils

### 6 Questions

Q1.
What is 424 x 13?
1,272
1,696
Q2.
What is 236 x 32?
1,180
472
Q3.
What is 379 x 24?
1,516
2,274
Q4.
What is 261 x 14?
1,044
1,305
Q5.
What is 205 x 32?
1,025
410
Q6.
What is 141 x 22?
282
423

## Exit quiz

Share with pupils

### 6 Questions

Q1.
What is 435 x 6?
2,480
480
Q2.
What is 646 x 5?
230
3,000
Q3.
What is 764 x 4?
2,846
846
Q4.
What is 261 x 51?
1,566
261
Q5.
What is 205 x 43?
1,435
615